U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McFall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 13, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Remark]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.