U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stambaugh et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.