U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abraham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 31, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Unseal Document]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • March 26, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • October 28, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.