U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 29, 2021: [Quash]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.