U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Humphrey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 20, 2021: [Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 08, 2018: [Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Remark]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.