U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:09-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGowan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 15, 2017: [Quash]
  • November 08, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 12, 2017: [Application for Writ]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.