U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minnick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 10, 2017: [Response to Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 25, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.