U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00115-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • January 06, 2021: [Remark]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • November 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 09, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 15, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 14, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
  • April 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.