U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McMillan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 15, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.