U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bingham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 03, 2017: [Quash]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 26, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • October 24, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.