U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brewer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Remark]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 21, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.