U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Competency Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Psychiatric Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.