U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 21, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 21, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • October 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.