U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.