U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 27, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 20, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 20, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.