U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Reply to Response]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 19, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • April 19, 2021: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 22, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • May 14, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 17, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Reply to Response]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 13, 2018: [Affidavit]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 05, 2017: [Remark]
  • May 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • May 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash Indictment/Information]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 04, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 27, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 26, 2016: [Quash Indictment/Information]
  • October 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 20, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 20, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.