U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ceron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Remark]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 29, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2018
  • January 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 04, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 27, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 20, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 20, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.