U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 23, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • October 19, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.