U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Amos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Remark]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • May 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • May 10, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 24, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 08, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 19, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 19, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.