U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 30, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • May 30, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 15, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 01, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 01, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 19, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.