U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 30, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 19, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 19, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.