U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Etienne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 03, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 20, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.