U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:98-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Damper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Remark]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 21, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 13, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Remark]
  • October 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.