U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-00017-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Bell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • December 12, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 30, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 20, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • May 24, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • November 15, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.