U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 21, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 13, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • April 05, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 04, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2017: [Response]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 08, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 14, 2016: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.