U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:04-cr-00055-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Radcliff et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 26, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Issued]
  • July 26, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • July 26, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.