U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hilterbrand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • July 15, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.