U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • July 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.