U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Reply to Response]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 14, 2017: [Recusal]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.