U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • January 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 06, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 13, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.