U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larabel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Remark]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • October 07, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.