U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00077-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Calhoun et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • June 13, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Reply to Response]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 12, 2021: [Response]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 19, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Seal or Restrict]
  • March 18, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Discovery]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • April 29, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2019: [Reply to Response]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Attachment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • March 25, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • October 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.