U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00041-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.