U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:05-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escobar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • August 27, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 29, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 29, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • September 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.