U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keys
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 16, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 19, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • October 08, 2021: [Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 24, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 04, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • December 21, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 14, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Attachment]
  • November 20, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • June 19, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • June 19, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 27, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 22, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Change of Address]
  • May 12, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.