U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 09, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 09, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 08, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 17, 2017: [Suppress]
  • January 10, 2017: [Trial Order]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 26, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 25, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 23, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 22, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 22, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.