U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gatlin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 22, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 22, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.