U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00117-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Reply to Response]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 15, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 09, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • January 08, 2021: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Restricted Document]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Restricted Document]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • October 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Attachment]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Restricted Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 07, 2016: [Restricted Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 23, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 22, 2016: [Restricted Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.