U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oatis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 21, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.