U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez-Guzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • September 21, 2016: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.