U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lemon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 15, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 21, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 05, 2018: [Mail Returned]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 26, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 07, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 30, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2017: [Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 17, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 20, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 06, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 21, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.