U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00080-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Creel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • October 13, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 21, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.