U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moody
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 06, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • October 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.