U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 04, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 30, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 21, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 21, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.