U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00074-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Holiday et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Response in Support]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Affidavit]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 29, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • August 29, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 17, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 28, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • June 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 24, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 17, 2018: [Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 13, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 10, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 09, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 07, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 13, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 02, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 25, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 23, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 18, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 15, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Remark]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 20, 2017: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 18, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 11, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 14, 2017: [Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 12, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2017: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
  • August 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 11, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 11, 2017: [Service by Publication]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 10, 2017: [Transcript Request]
  • April 07, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2017: [Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 26, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 25, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 09, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 28, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 27, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.