U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 29, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • November 18, 2021: [Restricted Document]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 25, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 24, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 06, 2020: [Reply to Response]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • July 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 23, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 23, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 23, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 01, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Restricted Document]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2019: [Remark]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Restricted Document]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 07, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • August 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • October 23, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2017: [Bond]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 15, 2017: [Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 11, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 05, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 16, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2017: [Waiver]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 12, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Defendant Severed from Codefendant(s)]
  • April 28, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • November 09, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • November 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 27, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 27, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Revoke]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 20, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2016: [Remark]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 18, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 13, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 26, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 26, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.