U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sims et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 19, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Attachment]
  • February 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [In Chambers Conference]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Suppress]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 02, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 14, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 11, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • July 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 03, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2017: [Attachment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 17, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 12, 2017: [Discovery]
  • April 10, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2017: [Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Waiver]
January, 2017
  • January 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 23, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 23, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 11, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 10, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 26, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 20, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 19, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 04, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 20, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.