U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Response to Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 20, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 23, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 29, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Response]
  • November 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 26, 2016: [Discovery]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 18, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 18, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 23, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 23, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.