U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez-Chavez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 26, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 18, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Restricted Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 20, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 19, 2019: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment - 2255]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2019: [Response to Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 13, 2018: [Reply to Response]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 15, 2018: [Affidavit]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 10, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • July 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 26, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 07, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Suppress]
  • June 14, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Seal]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • June 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Attachment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Appoint Expert]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response]
  • March 06, 2017: [Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 23, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 20, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 15, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 05, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 19, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 26, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 26, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.