U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 23, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2021: [Mail Returned]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 14, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 13, 2018: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
  • March 05, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 21, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 29, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2017: [Suppress]
  • August 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 14, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 05, 2017: [Suppress]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2017: [Suppress]
  • April 12, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 10, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 04, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 20, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.